TN HB1550 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 839
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 839
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes various changes to the disclosures, background checks, and training required for child care agencies, including requiring volunteers to disclose any criminal history and be subject to criminal history records checks. - Amends TCA Section 71-3-502 and Section 71-3-507.
Title
As enacted, makes various changes to the disclosures, background checks, and training required for child care agencies, including requiring volunteers to disclose any criminal history and be subject to criminal history records checks. - Amends TCA Section 71-3-502 and Section 71-3-507.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald McCormick [R] | Rep. Kevin Brooks [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] |
Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 839 | |
2016-04-06 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-04-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/6/2016 |
2016-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2016 |
2016-03-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/2/2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/23/2016 |
2016-01-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2016-01-14 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2554 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 839
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1550&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1550.pdf |