TN HB1546 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 560
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, adds as a ground on which termination of parental rights may be based the fact that the parent or legal guardian has been convicted of attempted first degree murder or attempted second degree murder of the child's other parent or legal guardian; revises provisions regarding similar ground based on civil liability or conviction for intentional and wrongful death. - Amends TCA Section 36-1-113.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, adds as a ground on which termination of parental rights may be based the fact that the parent or legal guardian has been convicted of attempted first degree murder or attempted second degree murder of the child's other parent or legal guardian; revises provisions regarding similar ground based on civil liability or conviction for intentional and wrongful death. - Amends TCA Section 36-1-113.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 560
2018-02-22HouseComp. SB subst.
2018-02-22HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-15HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/22/2018
2018-02-14HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/15/2018
2018-02-13HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-02-07HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/13/2018
2018-02-07HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2018-01-31HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/7/2018
2018-01-31HouseAction Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 2/7/2018
2018-01-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 1/31/2018
2018-01-19HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2018-01-18HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2018-01-17HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-11HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1608 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 560

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback