TN HB1542 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 986
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 986
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises certain provisions regarding eligible persons on referral list for services. - Amends TCA Title 33 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, revises certain provisions regarding eligible persons on referral list for services. - Amends TCA Title 33 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
Rep. Joe Pitts [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Craig Fitzhugh [D] | Rep. Kevin Brooks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 986 | |
2018-04-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-25 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/25/2018 |
2018-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-24 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/18 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2018-03-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-13 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/13/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/7/2018 |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-01-18 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-17 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-10 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1494 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 986