TN HB1539 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2022
Pending: House Health Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Rule of Law Life Act." - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 63 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to abortion.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06HouseAction Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2022
2021-03-31HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/6/2021
2021-03-30HouseAction Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 4/6/2021
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
2021-03-01HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2021-03-01HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2021-02-25HouseP1C.
2021-02-24HouseIntro.
2021-02-24HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0654 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback