TN HB1537 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department of education to develop a proposed rubric to assist the state textbook and instructional materials quality commission in reviewing and scoring textbooks and instructional materials proposed for adoption and submit the proposed rubric to the commission for approval; enacts other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 22.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 22, relative to instructional materials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 05/04/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 342 | |
2021-05-04 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-04-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 27, Nays 6 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0233) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-14 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 66, Nays 22, PNV 3 |
2021-04-14 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0211) |
2021-04-14 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0288) |
2021-04-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Action def. in Education Instruction to 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee |
2021-03-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction |
2021-02-25 | House | P1C. |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro. |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1036 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 342