TN HB1536 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Pub. Ch. 540
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Pub. Ch. 540
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds debit card fraud to the definition of unlawful conduct that must be reported to the comptroller of the treasury; adds certain certified public accountants and firms to those with a duty to report unlawful conduct to the comptroller; removes immunity from those reporters who knowingly provide false information. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 4, Part 5.
Title
As enacted, adds debit card fraud to the definition of unlawful conduct that must be reported to the comptroller of the treasury; adds certain certified public accountants and firms to those with a duty to report unlawful conduct to the comptroller; removes immunity from those reporters who knowingly provide false information. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 4, Part 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Pub. Ch. 540 | |
2018-03-13 | Effective date(s) 03/05/2018 | |
2018-03-05 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-02-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-02-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-02-16 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-13 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-02-12 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-02-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/12/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/8/2018 |
2018-02-06 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 2/6/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 1/31/2018 |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2018-01-17 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-01-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-10 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1486 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 540