TN HB1532 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, reduces the portion of a person's sentence for first degree murder that must be served prior to becoming eligible for parole to 60 percent of 60 years if sentenced to imprisonment for life for an offense committed during certain dates or 100 percent of 60 years if sentenced to imprisonment for life without the possibility of parole. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2 and Section 40-35-501.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2 and Section 40-35-501, relative to parole eligibility for persons sentenced to imprisonment for life.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2021-03-01HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2021-02-25HouseP1C.
2021-02-24HouseIntro.
2021-02-24HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0561 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-07 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback