TN HB1529 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pr. Ch. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pr. Ch. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, adds age and residency requirements to be eligible to run for mayor and city council; changes the voting requirement for filling vacancies for the city council; requires the city to obtain a fidelity bond for the mayor and treasurer; changes the due date for payment of taxes levied by the city to October 1 through December 31 of each year; requires certain ordinances to be published on the city's website. - Amends Chapter 101 of the Private Acts of 1993; as amended.
Title
Subject to local approval, adds age and residency requirements to be eligible to run for mayor and city council; changes the voting requirement for filling vacancies for the city council; requires the city to obtain a fidelity bond for the mayor and treasurer; changes the due date for payment of taxes levied by the city to October 1 through December 31 of each year; requires certain ordinances to be published on the city's website. - Amends Chapter 101 of the Private Acts of 1993; as amended.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Pr. Ch. 19 | |
2019-05-10 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-29 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-24 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-04-23 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-23 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-08 | House | P2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-04-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1538 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 19