TN HB1528 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Subject to local approval, establishes that chancery court has jurisdiction relating to the probate of wills and administration of estates, pursuant to general law, and that general sessions court has concurrent jurisdiction with the circuit and chancery courts over domestic relations cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Subject to local approval, establishes that chancery court has jurisdiction relating to the probate of wills and administration of estates, pursuant to general law, and that general sessions court has concurrent jurisdiction with the circuit and chancery courts over domestic relations cases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2019-04-25SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-24SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-23HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-22HousePassed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1
2019-04-17HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/22/2019
2019-04-16HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-16HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 4/16/2019
2019-04-08HouseP2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
2019-04-04HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-04-02HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1534 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-23 - Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/25/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback