TN HB1528 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pr. Ch. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pr. Ch. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, establishes that chancery court has jurisdiction relating to the probate of wills and administration of estates, pursuant to general law, and that general sessions court has concurrent jurisdiction with the circuit and chancery courts over domestic relations cases.
Title
Subject to local approval, establishes that chancery court has jurisdiction relating to the probate of wills and administration of estates, pursuant to general law, and that general sessions court has concurrent jurisdiction with the circuit and chancery courts over domestic relations cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Pr. Ch. 18 | |
2019-05-10 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-29 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-08 | House | P2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-04-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1534 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 18