TN HB1527 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pr. Ch. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pr. Ch. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, changes the municipal judge from an elected to appointed position; requires all persons employed by the city to take an oath of office; requires the board to establish, by resolution, which city officials are authorized to sign checks on the city's behalf. - Amends Chapter 58 of the Private Acts of 2012; as amended.
Title
Subject to local approval, changes the municipal judge from an elected to appointed position; requires all persons employed by the city to take an oath of office; requires the board to establish, by resolution, which city officials are authorized to sign checks on the city's behalf. - Amends Chapter 58 of the Private Acts of 2012; as amended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Pr. Ch. 17 | |
2019-05-10 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-29 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-24 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-23 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-23 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-08 | House | P2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-04-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1536 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 17