TN HB1527 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1078
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1078
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires, upon the filing of a suit for partition of real or personal property, the parties to submit the names of three commissioners selected and agreed upon by the parties; specifies that if the parties are unable to agree, the judge will appoint three commissioners. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 27.
Title
As enacted, requires, upon the filing of a suit for partition of real or personal property, the parties to submit the names of three commissioners selected and agreed upon by the parties; specifies that if the parties are unable to agree, the judge will appoint three commissioners. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 27.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 1078 | |
2016-05-23 | Effective date(s) 05/20/2016 | |
2016-05-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-05-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-22 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-04-21 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. SA1 Ayes 85, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB1527 |
2016-04-21 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/21/2016 |
2016-04-20 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/21/2016 |
2016-04-19 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/20/2016 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0941) |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-03-24 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-03-24 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-03-24 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0795) |
2016-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/24/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-08 | House | Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/8/2016 |
2016-03-01 | House | Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/8/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/17/2016 |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-14 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1692 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1078