TN HB1526 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pr. Ch. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pr. Ch. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, changes the county highway engineer position from elected to appointed and changes the county highway engineer's duties to only be the duties as provided in Tennessee County Uniform Highway Law. - Amends amend Chapter 38 of the Private Acts of 2018.
Title
Subject to local approval, changes the county highway engineer position from elected to appointed and changes the county highway engineer's duties to only be the duties as provided in Tennessee County Uniform Highway Law. - Amends amend Chapter 38 of the Private Acts of 2018.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Pr. Ch. 16 | |
2019-05-10 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-29 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-08 | House | P2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-04-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1533 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 16