TN HB1526 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 804
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 804
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases investment period by five years for a border region retail tourism development district. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 40.
Title
As enacted, increases investment period by five years for a border region retail tourism development district. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 40.
Sponsors
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. Marc Gravitt [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] |
Rep. Kevin Brooks [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 804 | |
2018-04-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-12 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/5/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-02-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-02-06 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/6/2018 |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2018-01-17 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2018-01-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-10 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1701 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 804