TN HB1520 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pr. Ch. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pr. Ch. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, increases from $250 to $500 the monthly compensation of the Robertson County highway commissioners and chairman of the commission. - Amends Chapter 380 of the Private Acts of 1947; as amended.
Title
Subject to local approval, increases from $250 to $500 the monthly compensation of the Robertson County highway commissioners and chairman of the commission. - Amends Chapter 380 of the Private Acts of 1947; as amended.
Sponsors
Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Pr. Ch. 13 | |
2019-05-10 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-29 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-03-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1531 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 13