TN HB1511 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-17 - Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-17 - Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands the teacher's bill of rights to include an educator's right to be guaranteed time to plan and prepare for classroom instruction prior to the first day of class each semester. - Amends TCA Section 49-5-209.
Title
As introduced, expands the teacher's bill of rights to include an educator's right to be guaranteed time to plan and prepare for classroom instruction prior to the first day of class each semester. - Amends TCA Section 49-5-209.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2018-01-17 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-01-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-10 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1677 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee