TN HB1510 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Pub. Ch. 404
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Pub. Ch. 404
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises certain provisions governing the distribution of revenue under the Business Tax Act; provides, in regard to the provisions governing financing under the Development District Act of 1965, that appropriations to the department of economic and community development for economic development district grants may be reduced in the amount of $174,000 (recurring) for the transfer of such amount to the commission on children and youth for the sole purpose of making a grant in such amount to the Tennessee CASA Association. - Amends amend TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 8; Title 9; Title 10; Title 11; Title 12; Title 13; Title 16; Title 17; Title 18; Title 29; Title 33; Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 43; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 49; Title 50; Title 53; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 57; Title 58; Title 59; Title 60; Title 62; Title 63; Title 64; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69; Title 70 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, revises certain provisions governing the distribution of revenue under the Business Tax Act; provides, in regard to the provisions governing financing under the Development District Act of 1965, that appropriations to the department of economic and community development for economic development district grants may be reduced in the amount of $174,000 (recurring) for the transfer of such amount to the commission on children and youth for the sole purpose of making a grant in such amount to the Tennessee CASA Association. - Amends amend TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 8; Title 9; Title 10; Title 11; Title 12; Title 13; Title 16; Title 17; Title 18; Title 29; Title 33; Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 43; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 49; Title 50; Title 53; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 57; Title 58; Title 59; Title 60; Title 62; Title 63; Title 64; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69; Title 70 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] |
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Gary Hicks [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: APPROPRIATIONS CAL. AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: APPROPRIATIONS CAL. AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Pub. Ch. 404 | |
2019-05-20 | Effective date(s) 05/17/2019 | |
2019-05-17 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-15 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-08 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0436) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-29 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-24 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0468) |
2019-04-24 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0465) |
2019-04-23 | House | H. Placed on Appropriations Calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/23/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-03-18 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-03-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1516 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 404