TN HB1509 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, decreases, from 10 to seven, the number of days before a county board of equalization adjourns before which a property assessor may provide taxpayers with an informal review of a property assessment or county reappraisal. - Amends TCA Title 66 and Title 67, Chapter 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 66 and Title 67, Chapter 5, relative to property taxes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
2023-03-16HouseSponsor change.
2023-03-16HousePlaced on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/22/2023
2023-03-15HouseAssigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee
2023-03-15HouseRef. to Local Government Committee
2023-02-16HouseSponsor withdrawn.
2023-02-16HouseSponsor change.
2023-02-02HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1340 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback