TN HB1509 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 498
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 498
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the department to utilize alternative methodologies to determine the cost of day care when setting the annual day care reimbursement rate and to take actions necessary to support the development of shared services alliances and family child care networks to improve the quality of child care in this state, give child care providers access to innovative child care business resource platforms, and provide a means of cost savings to child care providers through negotiated discounts. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 71, relative to child care.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam McKenzie [D] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Pat Marsh [R] |
Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Mike Stewart [D] | Rep. Vincent Dixie [D] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] |
Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 498 | |
2021-05-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-05-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Health Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-03-23 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1104 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2021