TN HB1506 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Population Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, changes from 10 days to three business days after an abortion the time within which the abortion must be reported to the office of vital records by the person in charge of the institution where the abortion was performed or by the attending physician. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 63 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to abortion.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-14HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Population Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
2023-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Population Health Subcommittee for 3/14/2023
2023-02-28HouseAction Def. in s/c Population Health Subcommittee to 3/14/2023
2023-02-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Population Health Subcommittee for 2/28/2023
2023-02-22HouseAssigned to s/c Population Health Subcommittee
2023-02-22HouseRef. to Health Committee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1013 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback