TN HB1505 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-17 - Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-17 - Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that the state funds may be used to continue the CoverKids program in the event that federal funds are no longer available; expresses the intent of the general assembly to provide additional state funds for the CoverKids program in the event that federal funds are no longer available. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Title
As introduced, specifies that the state funds may be used to continue the CoverKids program in the event that federal funds are no longer available; expresses the intent of the general assembly to provide additional state funds for the CoverKids program in the event that federal funds are no longer available. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Powell [D] | Rep. Joe Pitts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2018-01-17 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-10 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1632 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee