TN HB1504 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-3)
Status: Failed on February 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-03 - Failed in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-3)
Status: Failed on February 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-03 - Failed in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes standards for the wear and appearance of Tennessee state guard uniforms. - Amends TCA Section 58-1-304 and Title 58, Chapter 1, Part 4.
Title
As introduced, establishes standards for the wear and appearance of Tennessee state guard uniforms. - Amends TCA Section 58-1-304 and Title 58, Chapter 1, Part 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-03 | House | Failed in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2016-02-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/3/2016 |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2016-01-14 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2590 (Crossfiled) 2016-02-02 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1504&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1504.pdf |