TN HB1502 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Pursuant to the request of the Tenth special school district of Wilson County, permits the district to issue bonds or notes in an amount of $50 million or less and to issue bond anticipation notes in an amount of $50 million or less. - Amends Chapter 330 of the Acts of 1901.
Title
Pursuant to the request of the Tenth special school district of Wilson County, permits the district to issue bonds or notes in an amount of $50 million or less and to issue bond anticipation notes in an amount of $50 million or less. - Amends Chapter 330 of the Acts of 1901.
Sponsors
Rep. Clark Boyd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Action def. in Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-04 | House | P2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1512 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-28 - Refer to Senate Delayed Bills Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1502&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/HB1502.pdf |