TN HB1501 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "School Turnaround Pilot Program Act," which requires the department of education to develop and implement a five-year school turnaround pilot program for schools identified as in need of intervention. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1 and Title 49, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 1 and Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to kindergarten through grade twelve (K-12) education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-05-03HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021
2021-05-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021
2021-05-03HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-05-03HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021
2021-05-03HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-04-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021
2021-04-27HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to Next Calendar
2021-04-21HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/28/2021
2021-04-14HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2021-04-14HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-04-07HousePlaced on cal. Education Administration for 4/14/2021
2021-04-06HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration
2021-04-01HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 4/6/2021
2021-03-30HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
2021-03-01HouseAssigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
2021-02-25HouseP2C, ref. to Education Administration
2021-02-24HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-23HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0122 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-04 - Passed H., Ayes 81, Nays 12, PNV 0

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback