TN HB1500 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 954
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 954
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows a Tennessee student graduating from an out-of-state boarding school that is accredited by a member of the National Association of Independent Schools Commission on Accreditation to be eligible for Tennessee HOPE lottery scholarship, if the student meets all other applicable requirements for the scholarship. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Title
As enacted, allows a Tennessee student graduating from an out-of-state boarding school that is accredited by a member of the National Association of Independent Schools Commission on Accreditation to be eligible for Tennessee HOPE lottery scholarship, if the student meets all other applicable requirements for the scholarship. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-10 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-10 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 954 |
2014-04-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-14 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to lottery calendar |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/12/2014 |
2014-03-04 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-25 | House | Action Def. in Education Committee to 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 2/25/2014 |
2014-02-18 | House | Action Def. in Education Committee to 2/25/2014 |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 2/18/2014 |
2014-02-11 | House | Action Def. in Education Committee to 2/18/2014 |
2014-02-05 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 2/11/2014 |
2014-02-04 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 2/4/2014 |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2014-01-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Committee |
2014-01-16 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-15 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1778 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 954