TN HB1499 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 687
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 687
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends by one year the manner in which liquor-by-the-drink tax proceeds are distributed to local political subdivisions. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 49; Title 57 and Title 67.
Title
As enacted, extends by one year the manner in which liquor-by-the-drink tax proceeds are distributed to local political subdivisions. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 49; Title 57 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Pub. Ch. 687 | |
2018-04-17 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2018 | |
2018-04-09 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-03-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-28 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-23 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-27 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-02-26 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 3 |
2018-02-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/26/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/22/2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-06 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 2/20/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/6/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 1/31/2018 |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-01-11 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-01-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1794 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 687