TN HB1498 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 504
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 504
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions concerning judicial commitment of certain persons in the custody of the department of correction. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 40 and Title 41.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions concerning judicial commitment of certain persons in the custody of the department of correction. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 40 and Title 41.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 504 | |
2019-05-29 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-05-24 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-07 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0333) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-17 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-17 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0393) |
2019-04-17 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0237) |
2019-04-10 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/17/19 |
2019-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1340 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 504