TN HB1498 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-23 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-23 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the state board of education to promulgate a rule permitting the length of the school term to be calculated by instructional hours as well as the current number of instructional days. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-3004.
Title
As introduced, requires the state board of education to promulgate a rule permitting the length of the school term to be calculated by instructional hours as well as the current number of instructional days. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-3004.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning |
2016-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 2/16/2016 |
2016-02-02 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 2/16/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 2/2/2016 |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2016-01-14 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning--Government Operations for review |
2016-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1652 (Crossfiled) 2016-01-21 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1498&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1498.pdf |