TN HB1495 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, changes, from June 30, 2023 to June 30, 2020, the date on which the state palliative care and quality of life council is scheduled to terminate. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 71, Chapter 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, changes, from June 30, 2023 to June 30, 2020, the date on which the state palliative care and quality of life council is scheduled to terminate. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 71, Chapter 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-03-15HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/18/19
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2019
2019-03-11HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/11/2019
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1323 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-22 - Transmitted to Governor for action.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback