TN HB1494 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 868
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 868
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes county, municipal, and metropolitan mayors and chief executives to issue evacuation orders during a local state of emergency; creates Class C misdemeanor of willfully violating an evacuation order. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 9 and Title 58.
Title
As enacted, authorizes county, municipal, and metropolitan mayors and chief executives to issue evacuation orders during a local state of emergency; creates Class C misdemeanor of willfully violating an evacuation order. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 9 and Title 58.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Pub. Ch. 868 | |
2018-05-08 | Effective date(s) 05/03/2018 | |
2018-05-03 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 23, Nays 6, PNV 1 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0971) |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-04 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-04 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 76, Nays 2, PNV 0 |
2018-04-04 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0837) |
2018-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/7/2018 |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2018-01-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-01-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2205 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 868