TN HB1493 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Def. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, adds as requirements for sale of Kratom that sales only be made by retailers and sold only in packaging of five ounces to seven ounces; violation is a Class A misdemeanor. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4, relative to Kratom.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31HouseDef. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/31/2021
2021-03-24HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/31/2021
2021-03-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2021
2021-03-17HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/24/2021
2021-03-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2021
2021-03-01HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2021-02-25HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2021-02-24HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-23HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1390 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback