TN HB1493 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-17 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-17 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the emergency communications board to establish a uniform statewide emergency text message system for the purpose of assisting and responding to children in an emergency. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 86.
Title
As introduced, requires the emergency communications board to establish a uniform statewide emergency text message system for the purpose of assisting and responding to children in an emergency. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 86.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Carr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-01-11 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-01-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2206 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee