TN HB1492 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the City of Farragut, by a two-thirds vote of its governing body, to levy a privilege tax not to exceed 4 percent upon the privilege of occupancy. - Amends TCA Section 67-4-1425.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the City of Farragut, by a two-thirds vote of its governing body, to levy a privilege tax not to exceed 4 percent upon the privilege of occupancy. - Amends TCA Section 67-4-1425.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Roger Kane [R] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. Joe Pitts [D] |
Rep. John Windle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 700 | |
2018-03-22 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/22/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/15/2018 |
2018-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-01-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2018-01-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-01-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1503 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 700