TN HB1489 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 63-25)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Pub. Ch. 585
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 63-25)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Pub. Ch. 585
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, names the new high school to be constructed for the Tennessee School for the Deaf in honor of Alan J. Mealka.
Title
As enacted, names the new high school to be constructed for the Tennessee School for the Deaf in honor of Alan J. Mealka.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Pub. Ch. 585 | |
2016-03-22 | Effective date(s) 03/10/2016 | |
2016-03-10 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-03-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-03-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-03-02 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-02-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-08 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-02-02 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/8/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/2/2016 |
2016-01-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 1/26/2016 |
2016-01-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2016-01-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 1/19/2016 |
2016-01-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2016-01-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2016-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1595 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 585