TN HB1482 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2023, 01/01/2025
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2023, 01/01/2025
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows the Tennessee Association of Professional Bail Agents to provide or contract for one or more virtual classes for agents; increases the maximum amount the association may charge for eight hours of continuing education; prohibits a person from attending such continuing education classes if the person has been convicted in any state of certain offenses. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 11, Part 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, Chapter 11, Part 4, relative to the education of professional bondsmen.
Sponsors
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Lowell Russell [R] | Rep. Michele Carringer [R] |
Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-17 | Effective date(s) 05/11/2023, 01/01/2025 | |
2023-05-17 | Pub. Ch. 417 | |
2023-05-11 | Signed by Governor. | |
2023-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-28 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-24 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0357) |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-04-06 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-04-06 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2023-04-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-06 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0140) |
2023-03-30 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/6/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/30/2023 |
2023-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-03-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-07 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/7/2023 |
2023-02-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2023 |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1153 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 417