TN HB1474 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Historic Rehabilitation Tax Credit Act". - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 11, Part 1; Title 56, Chapter 4 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Historic Rehabilitation Tax Credit Act". - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 11, Part 1; Title 56, Chapter 4 and Title 67.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-11HouseRec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2014-03-05HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/11/2014
2014-03-04HouseAction Def. in Government Operations Committee to 3/11/2014
2014-02-26HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/4/2014
2014-01-16HouseP2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee for review--Finance
2014-01-15HouseIntro., P1C.
2014-01-14HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1723 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-18 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Tax Sub Comm.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback