TN HB1473 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires that the annual summary of reports of state department and agency programs relating to occupational safety and health be submitted by the commissioner of labor and workforce development to the governor and the general assembly no later than March 1 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 50 and Title 62.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires that the annual summary of reports of state department and agency programs relating to occupational safety and health be submitted by the commissioner of labor and workforce development to the governor and the general assembly no later than March 1 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 50 and Title 62.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1348 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback