TN HB1472 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts certain provisions relative to business or industries undergoing a reduction in operations that negatively impacts employees. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9; Title 10; Title 50; Title 64 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, enacts certain provisions relative to business or industries undergoing a reduction in operations that negatively impacts employees. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9; Title 10; Title 50; Title 64 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business Subcommittee of Commerce Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 5/28/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business Subcommittee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-28 | House | Reassigned to s/c Business Subcommittee |
2020-01-21 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2020-01-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 1/21/2020 |
2019-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2020 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Business Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1310 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-03 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 12/1/2020