TN HB1467 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-24 - Re-ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-24 - Re-ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires state agencies to submit an estimate of total compliance and implementation costs on the effects administrative rules and regulations have on small businesses within this state to the members of the joint government operations committees prior to filing the rule. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, requires state agencies to submit an estimate of total compliance and implementation costs on the effects administrative rules and regulations have on small businesses within this state to the members of the joint government operations committees prior to filing the rule. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-24 | House | Re-ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-01-22 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2020-01-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 1/22/2020 |
2019-03-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2020 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/4/2019 |
2019-02-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/18/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1329 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee