TN HB1464 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, defines "infrastructure" for purposes of the present law pertaining to industrial development corporations. - Amends TCA Section 1-3-105; Title 7; Title 64 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, defines "infrastructure" for purposes of the present law pertaining to industrial development corporations. - Amends TCA Section 1-3-105; Title 7; Title 64 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/16/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Local Government Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2018-01-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-12-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1475 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee