TN HB1463 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases offense from vehicular homicide to aggravated vehicular homicide when a person is convicted of driving with any amount of a Schedule I or Schedule II controlled substance in the person's blood, and the person has previously been convicted of driving under the influence or vehicular assault. - Amends TCA Section 39-13-218.
Title
As introduced, increases offense from vehicular homicide to aggravated vehicular homicide when a person is convicted of driving with any amount of a Schedule I or Schedule II controlled substance in the person's blood, and the person has previously been convicted of driving under the influence or vehicular assault. - Amends TCA Section 39-13-218.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Action def. in Judiciary to 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1506 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee