TN HB1462 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, changes, from 10 days to 10 business days, the period within which an applicant for a certificate of need for a nonresidential substitution-based treatment center for opiate addiction must notify the chief executive officer of the county or municipality of the filing of the application if it involves a healthcare facility in which the county or municipality is the lessor of the facility or real property on which it sits. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 16.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, changes, from 10 days to 10 business days, the period within which an applicant for a certificate of need for a nonresidential substitution-based treatment center for opiate addiction must notify the chief executive officer of the county or municipality of the filing of the application if it involves a healthcare facility in which the county or municipality is the lessor of the facility or real property on which it sits. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 16.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-09HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-08HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-08HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0183)
2019-04-04HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/2019
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019
2019-03-26HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19HouseAction def. in Health Committee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-12HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
2019-03-05HouseAction Def. in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee to 3/12/2019
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 3/5/2019
2019-02-27HouseAssigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee
2019-02-27HouseRef. to Health Committee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0637 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-10 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 2020

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback