TN HB1462 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1031
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires that estimates of the state funding board be adopted by a majority vote. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 9 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires that estimates of the state funding board be adopted by a majority vote. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 9 and Title 67.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23 Pub. Ch. 1031
2018-05-23 Effective date(s) 05/21/2018
2018-05-21 Signed by Governor.
2018-05-10HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2018-05-09SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-05-02HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-27HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2018-04-24SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0
2018-04-24SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA1166)
2018-04-24SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2018-04-24SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2018-04-23HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2018-04-23HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 4, PNV 0
2018-04-23HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-23HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1253)
2018-04-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/2018
2018-04-18HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2018
2018-04-18HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-04-18HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2018
2018-04-18HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-04-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2018
2018-04-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018
2018-03-21HouseReset on Final cal. of Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2018-03-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
2018-03-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/21/2018
2018-03-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
2018-03-07HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/14/2018
2018-02-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
2018-02-28HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/7/2018
2018-02-21HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/28/2018
2018-02-07HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-01-31HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/7/2018
2018-01-31HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 2/7/2018
2018-01-26HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-01-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 1/31/2018
2018-01-10HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2018-01-10HouseP2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-01-09HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-11-15HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1589 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1031

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback