TN HB1461 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Failed for lack of second in: Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates the Class E felony offense of purchasing, selling, possessing, or using a part, component, device, or attachment designed to accelerate the fire of a semi-automatic rifle and makes any semi-automatic rifle that includes an accelerated fire part, component, or device a prohibited weapon. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates the Class E felony offense of purchasing, selling, possessing, or using a part, component, device, or attachment designed to accelerate the fire of a semi-automatic rifle and makes any semi-automatic rifle that includes an accelerated fire part, component, or device a prohibited weapon. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03HouseFailed for lack of second in: Civil Justice Subcommittee
2018-03-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/3/2018
2018-03-07HouseReset on Final cal. of Civil Justice Subcommittee
2018-02-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
2018-02-28HouseAction Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/7/2018
2018-02-21HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2018
2018-02-21HouseAction Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 2/28/2018
2018-02-20HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/21/2018
2018-01-10HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2018-01-10HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee-- Criminal
2018-01-09HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-11-15HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1472 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback