TN HB1460 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-27 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-27 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each LEA and public charter school to provide age-appropriate instruction to public school students on black history in the fifth and eighth grades; directs the department of education to provide LEAs and public charter schools with black history resources and materials. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 10.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 10, relative to curriculum.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-27 | House | Withdrawn. |
2021-04-14 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Education Instruction |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Action def. in Education Instruction to 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1101 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-15 - Re-refer to Senate Education Comm.