TN HB1460 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds two members to the pest control board. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 21, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, adds two members to the pest control board. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 21, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Agriculture Committee | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on cal. Agriculture Committee for 04/28/2009 | |
2009-02-19 | P2C, ref. to Agriculture | |
2009-02-18 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0210 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-28 - Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 5/5/2009
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1460&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1460.pdf |