TN HB1459 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds to the provisions governing bail that following the arrest of a person for the offense of aggravated assault under circumstances in which the alleged victim of the offense is a domestic abuse victim, that the court or magistrate must make certain findings and, based on the findings, may extend the 12-hour hold period up to 24 hours after the time of arrest; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 36; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36; Title 39 and Title 40, relative to domestic violence.
Sponsors
Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D] | Rep. Brandon Ogles [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2022 | |
2022-04-25 | Pub. Ch. 828 | |
2022-04-19 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-04-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-01 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 1 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0710) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-10 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-03-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-10 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0550) |
2022-03-10 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 86, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/10/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/3/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/16/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/2/2022 |
2021-03-31 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1546 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 828