TN HB1459 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Reset on Final cal. of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases the age to access or use tobacco and vapor products from 18 to 21 years of age. - Amends TCA Title 39.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, increases the age to access or use tobacco and vapor products from 18 to 21 years of age. - Amends TCA Title 39.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05HouseReset on Final cal. of Health Committee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/5/2019
2019-02-27HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0849 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-18 - Sponsor(s) Added.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback