TN HB1457 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 59-0)
Status: Introduced on August 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Def. to Summer Study in Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Def. to Summer Study in Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes the Tennessee taxpayer relief and recession reserve; clarifies that deposits into the reserve for revenue fluctuation and the relief and recession reserve do not count toward the Copeland Cap; provides an automatic, temporary sales tax reduction when there are sufficient over collections to offset the loss of revenue. - Amends TCA Title 9 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, establishes the Tennessee taxpayer relief and recession reserve; clarifies that deposits into the reserve for revenue fluctuation and the relief and recession reserve do not count toward the Copeland Cap; provides an automatic, temporary sales tax reduction when there are sufficient over collections to offset the loss of revenue. - Amends TCA Title 9 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to Next Calendar |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-02-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-30 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2018-01-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-01-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-08-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2649 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-10 - Deferred to Summer Study