TN HB1455 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a court from sentencing a defendant convicted of first degree murder to death if the defendant proves by a preponderance of the evidence that, at the time of the offense, the defendant had a severe mental illness. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, prohibits a court from sentencing a defendant convicted of first degree murder to death if the defendant proves by a preponderance of the evidence that, at the time of the offense, the defendant had a severe mental illness. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/11/2020 |
2019-03-20 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Judiciary |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1124 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee